Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Donald William Montrose

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Stockton, California, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 May 1923Born
7 May 194925.9Ordained PriestPriest of Los Angeles, California, USA
25 Mar 198359.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Los Angeles, California, USA
25 Mar 198359.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Forum Novum
12 May 198359.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Forum Novum
17 Dec 198562.5AppointedBishop of Stockton, California, USA
20 Feb 198662.7InstalledBishop of Stockton, California, USA
18 Jan 199975.6ResignedBishop of Stockton, California, USA
7 May 200884.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Stockton, California, USA

MicroData Summary for Donald William Montrose
Bishop Donald William Montrose (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Stockton

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDenver

  • a priest for 59.0 years
  • a bishop for 24.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 116
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast