Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Alfredo Arzube

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Los Angeles, California

Titular Bishop of Civitate


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jun 1918BornGuayaquil, Ecuador
5 May 195435.9Ordained PriestPriest of Los Angeles, California, USA
9 Feb 197152.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Los Angeles, California, USA
9 Feb 197152.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Civitate
25 Mar 197152.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Civitate
7 Sep 199375.3RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Los Angeles, California, USA
25 Dec 200789.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Los Angeles, California, USA

MicroData Summary for Juan Alfredo Arzube:
Bishop Juan Alfredo Arzube (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Los Angeles

  • a priest for 53.6 years
  • a bishop for 36.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 116
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013