Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Armando Xavier Ochoa

Bishop of Fresno, California, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Apr 1943 Born
23 May 197027.1Ordained PriestPriest of Los Angeles, California, USA
23 Dec 198643.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Los Angeles, California, USA
23 Dec 198643.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Sitifis
23 Feb 198743.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sitifis
1 Apr 199652.9AppointedBishop of El Paso, Texas, USA
26 Jun 199653.2InstalledBishop of El Paso, Texas, USA
1 Dec 201168.6AppointedBishop of Fresno, California, USA
2 Feb 201268.8InstalledBishop of Fresno, California, USA

MicroData Summary for Armando Xavier Ochoa
Bishop Armando Xavier Ochoa (born ) Bishop of Fresno

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOxnard

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Fresno.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127
  • b: Bollettino, 1 Dec 2011

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast