Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gabino Zavala

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Los Angeles, California, USA

Titular Bishop of Tamascani


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Sep 1951 Born
28 May 197725.7Ordained PriestPriest of Los Angeles, California, USA
8 Feb 199442.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Los Angeles, California, USA
8 Feb 199442.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Tamascani
19 Mar 199442.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tamascani
4 Jan 201260.3ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Los Angeles, California, USA

MicroData Summary for Gabino Zavala
Bishop Gabino Zavala (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Los Angeles

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTijuana, México

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Los Angeles.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137, Number 12,257
  • r: Bollettino, 4 Jan 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018