Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of El Paso

Dioecesis Elpasensis



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Mark Joseph Seitz, Bishop
  • Anthony Cerdan Celino, Auxiliary Bishop

General Information


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
3 March 1914ErectedDiocese of Dallas
Diocese of San Antonio
Diocese of Tucson
Diocese of El Paso (erected)
16 October 1961Territory LostDiocese of Amarillo (Counties of Kimble, Sutton, Crockett, Schleicher, Concho, Menard, Tom Green, Irion, Reagan, Upton, Crane, Ector, Midland, Glasscock, Sterling, Coke, Nolan, Mitchell, Howard, Martin, Andrews, Scurry, Fisher, and Stonewall)
Diocese of Austin (Counties of McCulloch, Brown, and Coleman)
Diocese of Dallas-Fort Worth (Counties of Runnels, Callhan, Taylor, Jones, and Haskell)
Diocese of El Paso (Counties of Pecos and Terrei)
Diocese of San Angelo (erected)
15 February 1969Territory AddedDiocese of Ciudad Juárez (In the region EI Chamizal, now match the civil boundaries)
Diocese of El Paso (In the region EI Chamizal, now match the civil boundaries)
17 August 1982Territory LostDiocese of El Paso (Counties of Doña Ana, Eddy, Grant, Hildago, Lea, Luna, and Otero)
Archdiocese of Santa Fe (Counties of Chavez, Lincoln, and Sierra)
Diocese of Las Cruces (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
1950144,591427,93933.8%46811271,1388940452ap1951
1966200,000620,00032.3%93821751,14220940170ap1967
1970185,000700,00026.4%1347721187610538668ap1971
1976216,000654,21333.0%93731661,301113734072ap1977
1980264,510811,00032.6%97751721,5373312737579ap1981
1990435,000650,00066.9%73531263,4522610321151ap1991
1999597,275784,51176.1%92401324,524141624758ap2000
2000612,207793,21077.2%92401324,637148324358ap2001
2001630,573798,76378.9%92421344,705148324758ap2002
2002648,340799,84381.1%86371235,271117725358ap2003
2003647,000801,00080.8%86371235,260117724158ap2004
2004656,035811,73980.8%81361175,607117525458ap2005
2006668,000827,00080.8%67401076,242147516254ap2007
2013689,549877,94078.5%68431116,212256811857ap2014
2016693,793884,40778.4%65451106,307356310357ap2017
2019720,226900,28380.0%65501156,262336810060ap2020
2021718,503900,38079.8%72461186,089286010099ap2022

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 61, Page 198, and Page 199

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2023
Code: web_d, v3.4.4, 25 Feb 2023; Data: 22 May 2023