Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anthony Joseph Schuler, S.J. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of El Paso, Texas

Titular Bishop of Aradus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Sep 1869BornSaint Mary’s, PA
8 Dec 188819.2ProfessedMember of Society of Jesus
27 Jun 190131.8Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
17 Jun 191545.7AppointedBishop of El Paso, Texas, USA
28 Oct 191546.1Ordained BishopBishop of El Paso, Texas, USA
29 Nov 194273.2ResignedBishop of El Paso, Texas, USA
29 Nov 194273.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Aradus
3 Jun 194474.7DiedBishop Emeritus of El Paso, Texas, USA

MicroData Summary for Anthony Joseph Schuler:
Bishop Anthony Joseph Schuler S.J. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of El Paso

  • a priest for 42.9 years
  • a bishop for 28.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1915, Number 67

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013