Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop John Baptist Pitaval

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Santa Fe, New Mexico, USA

Titular Archbishop of Amida


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Feb 1858Born
24 Dec 188123.8Ordained PriestPriest of Colorado, USA
14 May 190244.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Santa Fe, New Mexico, USA
14 May 190244.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Sora
25 Jul 190244.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sora
1 Feb 190950.9AppointedArchbishop of Santa Fe, New Mexico, USA
29 Jul 191860.4ResignedArchbishop of Santa Fe, New Mexico, USA
29 Jul 191860.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Amida
23 May 192870.2DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Santa Fe, New Mexico, USA

MicroData Summary for John Baptist Pitaval
Archbishop John Baptist Pitaval (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Santa Fe

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Genis-Terrenoire, France

  • a priest for 46.4 years
  • a bishop for 25.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 525
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 51
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1902, Number 47

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast