Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Aloysius Murphy, S.J. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of British Honduras, Belize

Titular Bishop of Birtha


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Dec 1857Born
26 Aug 188830.6Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
23 Dec 192365.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of British Honduras, Belize
23 Dec 192365.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Birtha
19 Mar 192466.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Birtha
4 May 192466.3InstalledVicar Apostolic of British Honduras, Belize
16 Jul 193880.5RetiredVicar Apostolic of Belize
25 Nov 193981.9DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Belize

MicroData Summary for Joseph Aloysius Murphy
Bishop Joseph Aloysius Murphy S.J. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of British Honduras

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDunkalk in Louth, Ireland

  • a priest for 51.2 years
  • a bishop for 15.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1924, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018