Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Sastre y Riutort, C.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of San Pedro Sula

Titular Bishop of Germaniciana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 May 1883BornSanta Eugenia de Mallorca, Spain
18 Dec 190724.6Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
15 Apr 192440.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of San Pedro Sula, Honduras
29 Apr 192441.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Germaniciana
10 Aug 192441.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Germaniciana
23 Mar 194965.9DiedVicar Apostolic of San Pedro Sula, Honduras

MicroData Summary for Juan Sastre y Riutort:
Bishop Juan Sastre y Riutort C.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of San Pedro Sula

  • a priest for 41.3 years
  • a bishop for 24.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1924, Number 51

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013