Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Agustín Blessing Presinger, C.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Limón, Costa Rica

Titular Bishop of Tegea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 May 1868Born
24 Feb 189425.7Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
16 Dec 192153.5AppointedVicar Apostolic of Limón, Costa Rica
21 Dec 192153.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Tegea
1 May 192253.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tegea
1 Feb 193465.7DiedVicar Apostolic of Limón, Costa Rica

MicroData Summary for Agustín Blessing Presinger
Bishop Agustín Blessing Presinger C.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Limón

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTreffelhausen, Germany

  • a priest for 39.9 years
  • a bishop for 11.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1935
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1922, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast