Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni Battista Marenco, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Apostolic Internuncio to Central America

Titular Archbishop of Edessa in Macedonia

Apostolic Delegate to Guatemala

Apostolic Internuncio to Honduras

Apostolic Internuncio to Nicaragua

Apostolic Delegate to El Salvador


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Apr 1853Born
18 Dec 187522.6Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
29 Apr 190956.0AppointedBishop of Massa Carrara, Italy
16 May 190956.0Ordained BishopBishop of Massa Carrara, Italy
7 Jan 191763.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Edessa in Macedonia
2 Feb 191763.7AppointedApostolic Internuncio to Costa Rica
2 Feb 191763.7AppointedApostolic Internuncio to Honduras
2 Feb 191763.7AppointedApostolic Internuncio to Nicaragua
15 Sep 192067.3AppointedApostolic Delegate to Guatemala
15 Sep 192067.3AppointedApostolic Delegate to El Salvador
22 Oct 192168.4DiedApostolic Internuncio to Costa Rica

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Marenco (VIAF: 307384941)
Archbishop Giovanni Battista Marenco S.D.B. (born , died ) Apostolic Internuncio of Central America

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOvada, Archdiocese of L’Aquila, Italy
Death PlaceTorino, Archdiocese of Torino {Turin}, Italy

  • a priest for 45.8 years
  • a bishop for 12.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1921
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1909, Number 24
  • nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 104, and Page 145, and Page 179

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 11 Mar 2018