Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio del Carmen Monestel y Zamora

Deceased

Bishop of Alajuela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jul 1868BornSan José
19 Dec 189123.4Ordained PriestPriest of San José de Costa Rica
23 Feb 191546.6AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Comayagua, Honduras
23 Feb 191546.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Sora
25 Jul 191547.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sora
10 Mar 192152.7AppointedBishop of Alajuela, Costa Rica
14 Aug 192153.1InstalledBishop of Alajuela, Costa Rica
8 Oct 193769.2DiedBishop of Alajuela, Costa Rica

MicroData Summary for Antonio del Carmen Monestel y Zamora:
Bishop Antonio del Carmen Monestel y Zamora (born , died ) Bishop of Alajuela

  • a priest for 45.8 years
  • a bishop for 22.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 42
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1915, Number 44

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013