Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Angel Maria Navarro

Deceased

Bishop of Santa Rosa de Copán


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Aug 1870BornGuarita
29 May 189928.8Ordained PriestPriest
17 Dec 192858.4AppointedBishop of Santa Rosa de Copán, Honduras
7 Apr 192958.7Ordained BishopBishop of Santa Rosa de Copán, Honduras
31 Jul 195181.0DiedBishop of Santa Rosa de Copán, Honduras

MicroData Summary for Angel Maria Navarro:
Bishop Angel Maria Navarro (born , died ) Bishop of Santa Rosa de Copán

  • a priest for 52.2 years
  • a bishop for 22.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1929, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013