Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Luis Durou y Sure, C.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Guatemala


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Feb 1870Born
8 Mar 189525.1Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
30 Jun 192858.4AppointedArchbishop of Guatemala
11 Nov 192858.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Guatemala
12 Nov 192858.7AppointedApostolic Administrator of Verapaz and Petén, Guatemala
14 Jan 193564.9CeasedApostolic Administrator of Verapaz and Petén, Guatemala
17 Dec 193868.8DiedArchbishop of Guatemala

MicroData Summary for Luis Durou y Sure
Archbishop Luis Durou y Sure C.M. (born , died ) Archbishop of Guatemala

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSainte-Sabine, France

  • a priest for 43.7 years
  • a bishop for 10.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: JPG
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1939
  • c3+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1928, Number 75

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018