Catholic-Hierarchy DC

John Joseph Cardinal Glennon

Deceased

Archbishop of Saint Louis, Missouri, USA

Cardinal-Priest of San Clemente


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jun 1862Born
20 Dec 188422.5Ordained PriestPriest of Kansas City, Missouri, USA
1894²31.5AppointedApostolic Administrator of Kansas City, Missouri, USA
24 Mar 189633.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Kansas City, Missouri, USA
24 Mar 189633.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Pinara
29 Jun 189634.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Pinara
27 Apr 190340.8AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Saint Louis, Missouri, USA
13 Oct 190341.3SucceededArchbishop of Saint Louis, Missouri, USA
18 Feb 194683.6Elevated to Cardinal
22 Feb 194683.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Clemente
9 Mar 194683.7DiedArchbishop of Saint Louis, Missouri, USA

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for John Joseph Glennon (VIAF: 11852753)
John Joseph Cardinal Glennon (born , died ) Archbishop of Saint Louis

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKinnegad, Diocese of Meath, Ireland
Ordained PriestKansas City, Diocese of Kansas City, Missouri
Ordained BishopCathedral, Kansas City, Diocese of Kansas City, Missouri
Death PlaceDublin, Archdiocese of Dublin, Ireland
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Kansas City, Diocese of Kansas City, Missouri

  • a priest for 61.2 years
  • a bishop for 49.6 years
  • a cardinal for .0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 328, and Page 352
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 454
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1896, Number 27
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jun 2017