Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Saint Joseph

Dioecesis Sancti Iosephi

United

To: Diocese of Kansas City-Saint Joseph



Show: All | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Historical Details


Past Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
3 March 1868ErectedArchdiocese of Saint Louis Diocese of Saint Joseph (erected)
16 June 1911Territory AddedArchdiocese of Saint Louis Diocese of Saint Joseph (Counties of Clark, Adair, Knox, Lewis, Macon, Shelby, Marion, Chariton, Randolph, Monroe, and Ralls)
2 July 1956Territory LostDiocese of Saint Joseph
Archdiocese of Saint Louis
Diocese of Springfield-Cape Girardeau (erected)
2 July 1956Territory LostDiocese of Saint Joseph
Archdiocese of Saint Louis
Diocese of Jefferson City (erected)
2 July 1956UnitedDiocese of Kansas City
Diocese of Saint Joseph
Diocese of Kansas City-Saint Joseph

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
195032,063633,9875.1%82491312445635465ap1951

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.8.9, 26 Feb 2013; data: 12 Mar 2013