Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop David Francis Hickey, S.J. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Belize

Titular Bishop of Cabasa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Dec 1882Born
27 Jun 191734.5Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
10 Jun 194865.5AppointedVicar Apostolic of Belize
10 Jun 194865.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Bonitza
21 Sep 194865.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bonitza
29 Feb 195673.2AppointedBishop of Belize
13 Jul 195774.6RetiredBishop of Belize
13 Jul 195774.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Cabasa
24 Aug 197390.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Belize

MicroData Summary for David Francis Hickey
Bishop David Francis Hickey S.J. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Belize

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint Louis, MO, USA

  • a priest for 56.1 years
  • a bishop for 24.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1974
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1948, Number 99

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast