Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tadeu Henrique (Jude) Prost, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Belém do Pará, Para

Titular Bishop of Fronta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Dec 1915BornChicago, IL, USA
24 Jun 194226.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
23 Aug 196246.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Belém do Pará, Para, Brazil
23 Aug 196246.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Fronta
1 Nov 196246.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Fronta
13 Mar 199276.3RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Belém do Pará, Para, Brazil
2 Aug 199478.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Belém do Pará, Para, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Tadeu Henrique (Jude) Prost:
Bishop Tadeu Henrique (Jude) Prost O.F.M. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Belém do Pará

  • a priest for 52.1 years
  • a bishop for 31.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1962, Number 175

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013