Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles Roman Koester

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Saint Louis, Missouri

Titular Bishop of Suacia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Sep 1915BornJefferson City, MO
20 Dec 194126.2Ordained PriestPriest of Saint Louis, Missouri, USA
2 Jan 197155.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Saint Louis, Missouri, USA
2 Jan 197155.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Suacia
11 Feb 197155.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Suacia
10 Sep 199175.9RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Saint Louis, Missouri, USA
24 Dec 199782.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Saint Louis, Missouri, USA

MicroData Summary for Charles Roman Koester:
Bishop Charles Roman Koester (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Saint Louis

  • a priest for 56.0 years
  • a bishop for 26.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015