Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop George Joseph Lucas

Archbishop of Omaha, Nebraska, USA

Apostolic Administrator of Lincoln, Nebraska


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jun 1949 Born
24 May 197525.9Ordained PriestPriest of Saint Louis, Missouri, USA
19 Oct 199950.3AppointedBishop of Springfield in Illinois, USA
14 Dec 199950.5Ordained BishopBishop of Springfield in Illinois, USA
3 Jun 200959.9AppointedArchbishop of Omaha, Nebraska, USA
22 Jul 200960.1InstalledArchbishop of Omaha, Nebraska, USA
13 Dec 201970.5AppointedApostolic Administrator of Lincoln, Nebraska, USA

MicroData Summary for George Joseph Lucas (VIAF: 25768)
Archbishop George Joseph Lucas (born ) Archbishop of Omaha

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint Louis
Ordained BishopImmaculate Conception, Cathedral, Springfield, Diocese of Springfield in Illinois

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Omaha.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 3 Jun 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 157, Number 13,656
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 223, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • ab: CB, 13 Dec 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.6, 19 Dec 2019; Data: 16 Jan 2020

Quantcast