Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Christopher Edward Byrne

Deceased

Bishop of Galveston, Texas


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Apr 1867BornByrnesville, MO
23 Sep 189124.4Ordained PriestPriest of Saint Louis, Missouri, USA
18 Jul 191851.2AppointedBishop of Galveston, Texas, USA
10 Nov 191851.6Ordained BishopBishop of Galveston, Texas, USA
1 Apr 195082.9DiedBishop of Galveston, Texas, USA

MicroData Summary for Christopher Edward Byrne:
Bishop Christopher Edward Byrne (born , died ) Bishop of Galveston

  • a priest for 58.5 years
  • a bishop for 31.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1918, Number 49

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013