Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Myron Joseph Cotta

Bishop of Stockton, California, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Mar 1953 Born
12 Sep 198734.4Ordained PriestPriest of Fresno, California, USA
24 Jan 201460.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Sacramento, California, USA
24 Jan 201460.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Muteci
25 Mar 201461.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Muteci
23 Jan 201864.8AppointedBishop of Stockton, California, USA
15 Mar 201864.9InstalledBishop of Stockton, California, USA

MicroData Summary for Myron Joseph Cotta
Bishop Myron Joseph Cotta (born ) Bishop of Stockton

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDos Palos
Ordained BishopBlessed Sacrament, Cathedral, Sacramento, Diocese of Sacramento, California

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Stockton.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 24 Jan 2014
  • ob: CB, 24 Jan 2014
  • c2+: CB, 14 Mar 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 217, Number 18,120
  • ab: Bollettino, 23 Jan 2018
  • i: CB, 23 Jan 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast