Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José de Jesús Madera Uribe, M.Sp.S. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of United States of America, Military

Titular Bishop of Hortanum (Horta)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Nov 1927Born
3 Oct 194820.8ProfessedMember of Missionaries of the Holy Spirit
15 Jun 195729.5Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of the Holy Spirit
12 Dec 197952.0AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Fresno, California, USA
4 Mar 198052.2Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Fresno, California, USA
1 Jul 198052.5SucceededBishop of Fresno, California, USA
28 May 199163.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of United States of America, Military
28 May 199163.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Hortanum (Horta)
15 Sep 200476.8RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of United States of America, Military
21 Jan 201789.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of United States of America, Military

MicroData Summary for José de Jesús Madera Uribe
Bishop José de Jesús Madera Uribe M.Sp.S. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of United States of America, Military

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Francisco, Archdiocese of San Francisco, California
Ordained BishopFresno, Diocese of Fresno, California
Death PlaceCulver City, CA

  • a priest for 59.5 years
  • a bishop for 36.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 22 Jan 2017
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 234, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 58, Number 4,326
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 59, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 65, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast