Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop George Patrick Ziemann

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Santa Rosa in California


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Sep 1941BornPasadena
29 Apr 196725.6Ordained PriestPriest of Los Angeles, California, USA
23 Dec 198645.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Los Angeles, California, USA
23 Dec 198645.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Obba
23 Feb 198745.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Obba
14 Jul 199250.8AppointedBishop of Santa Rosa in California, USA
22 Jul 199957.9ResignedBishop of Santa Rosa in California, USA
22 Oct 200968.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Santa Rosa in California, USA

MicroData Summary for George Patrick Ziemann:
Bishop George Patrick Ziemann (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Santa Rosa in California

  • a priest for 42.5 years
  • a bishop for 22.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 200, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013