Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sylvester Donovan Ryan

Bishop Emeritus of Monterey in California


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Sep 1930 BornAvalon
3 May 195726.6Ordained PriestPriest of Los Angeles, California, USA
17 Feb 199059.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Los Angeles, California, USA
17 Feb 199059.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Remesiana
31 May 199059.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Remesiana
28 Jan 199261.4AppointedBishop of Monterey in California, USA
19 Mar 199261.5InstalledBishop of Monterey in California, USA
19 Dec 200676.2RetiredBishop of Monterey in California, USA

MicroData Summary for Sylvester Donovan Ryan:
Bishop Sylvester Donovan Ryan (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Monterey in California

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Monterey in California.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 19 Dec 2006
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 122, Number 10,970
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015