Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles Morerod, O.P.

Bishop of Lausanne, Genève et Fribourg (Freiburg)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Oct 1961 BornRiaz
10 Feb 198422.3ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
20 Feb 198725.3Solemn ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
30 Apr 198826.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
3 Nov 201150.0AppointedBishop of Lausanne, Genève et Fribourg (Freiburg), Switzerland
11 Dec 201150.1Ordained BishopBishop of Lausanne, Genève et Fribourg (Freiburg), Switzerland

MicroData Summary for Charles Morerod:
Bishop Charles Morerod O.P. (born ) Bishop of Lausanne, Genève et Fribourg (Freiburg)

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Lausanne, Genève et Fribourg (Freiburg).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 3 Nov 2011
  • ob: CB, 3 Nov 2011
  • c2: CB, 16 Nov 2011
  • c3: CB, 30 Nov 2011
  • c4: CB, 3 Dec 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Number 17,190

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 3 Sep 2014