Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Georges Marie Martin Cardinal Cottier, O.P. †

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Domenico e Sisto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Apr 1922BornCéligny, Switzerland
4 Jul 194624.1ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
2 Jul 195129.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
7 Oct 200381.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Tullia
20 Oct 200381.4Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Tullia
21 Oct 200381.4AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santi Domenico e Sisto
21 Oct 200381.4Elevated to Cardinal
12 Jun 201492.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Domenico e Sisto
31 Mar 201693.9DiedCardinal-Priest of Santi Domenico e Sisto

MicroData Summary for Georges Marie Martin Cottier
Georges Marie Martin Cardinal Cottier O.P. (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of Santi Domenico e Sisto

  • a priest for 64.7 years
  • a bishop for 12.4 years
  • a cardinal for 12.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Number 14,476
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church
  • ab: CB, 12 Jun 2014
  • d: CB, 1 Apr 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 1 Apr 2016