Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernard Genoud

Deceased

Bishop of Lausanne, Genève et Fribourg (Freiburg)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Feb 1942BornChâtel-Saint-Denis
22 Jun 196826.3Ordained PriestPriest of Lausanne, Genève et Fribourg (Freiburg), Switzerland
18 Mar 199957.0AppointedBishop of Lausanne, Genève et Fribourg (Freiburg), Switzerland
24 May 199957.2Ordained BishopBishop of Lausanne, Genève et Fribourg (Freiburg), Switzerland
21 Sep 201068.5DiedBishop of Lausanne, Genève et Fribourg (Freiburg), Switzerland

MicroData Summary for Bernard Genoud
Bishop Bernard Genoud (born , died ) Bishop of Lausanne, Genève et Fribourg (Freiburg)

  • a priest for 42.2 years
  • a bishop for 11.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 155, Number 13,561
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 1 Apr 2016