Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giorgio Corbellini

Deceased

President of the Labour Office of the Apostolic See

Titular Bishop of Abula


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Apr 1947Born
10 Jul 197124.2Ordained PriestPriest of Piacenza, Italy
16 Sep 198942.4IncardinatedPriest of Piacenza-Bobbio, Italy
3 Jul 200962.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Abula
3 Jul 200962.2AppointedPresident of the Labour Office of the Apostolic See
12 Sep 200962.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Abula
28 Feb 201365.8CeasedPresident of the Labour Office of the Apostolic See
16 Mar 201365.9ConfirmedPresident of the Labour Office of the Apostolic See
13 Nov 201972.5DiedPresident of the Labour Office of the Apostolic See

MicroData Summary for Giorgio Corbellini (VIAF: 35993506)
Bishop Giorgio Corbellini (born , died ) President of Labour Office of the Apostolic See

EventPlace
Birth PlaceViserano di Travo, Diocese of Piacenza, Italy
Ordained PriestSan Lazzaro e San Vincenzo de' Paoli, Church, Piacenza, Diocese of Piacenza, Italy
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceParma, Diocese of Parma (-Fontevivo), Italy
Buried Place (Original)Cemetery, Viserano di Travo, Diocese of Piacenza-Bobbio, Italy

  • a priest for 48.3 years
  • a bishop for 10.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 3 Jul 2009
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 199, Number 16,277
  • c: Bollettino, 16 Mar 2013
  • d: CB, 14 Nov 2019
  • loc: AM, 25 Jan 2020
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 242, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast