Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Enrico Manfredini

Deceased

Archbishop of Bologna


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jan 1922BornSuzzara
26 May 194523.3Ordained PriestPriest of Milano {Milan}, Italy
4 Oct 196947.7AppointedBishop of Piacenza, Italy
4 Nov 196947.8Ordained BishopBishop of Piacenza, Italy
18 Mar 198361.2AppointedArchbishop of Bologna, Italy
16 Dec 198361.9DiedArchbishop of Bologna, Italy

MicroData Summary for Enrico Manfredini:
Archbishop Enrico Manfredini (born , died ) Archbishop of Bologna

  • a priest for 38.6 years
  • a bishop for 14.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 130

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013