Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Umberto Malchiodi

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Piacenza, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Nov 1889Born
1 Jun 191222.5Ordained PriestPriest
14 Nov 193849.0AppointedArchbishop of Camerino, Italy
21 Dec 193849.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Camerino, Italy
18 Feb 194656.2AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Piacenza, Italy
18 Feb 194656.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Serrae
30 Jun 196171.6SucceededArchbishop (Personal Title) of Piacenza, Italy
3 Oct 196979.9RetiredBishop of Piacenza, Italy
3 Oct 196979.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Astigi
14 Jan 197181.1ResignedTitular Archbishop of Astigi
11 Nov 197485.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Piacenza, Italy

MicroData Summary for Umberto Malchiodi
Archbishop Umberto Malchiodi (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Piacenza

EventPlace
Birth PlacePiacenza

  • a priest for 62.4 years
  • a bishop for 35.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1938, Number 102

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 Apr 2017