Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Raffaele Campelli

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Cagli e Pergola, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Aug 1887Born
25 Jul 191123.9Ordained PriestPriest
8 Aug 193951.9AppointedBishop of Cagli e Pergola, Italy
1 Oct 193952.1Ordained BishopBishop of Cagli e Pergola, Italy
15 Jan 197789.4RetiredBishop of Cagli e Pergola, Italy
1 Feb 198294.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Cagli e Pergola, Italy

MicroData Summary for Raffaele Campelli
Bishop Raffaele Campelli (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Cagli e Pergola

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBelforte sul Chienti

  • a priest for 70.5 years
  • a bishop for 42.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1939, Number 51

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast