Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Achille Salvucci

Deceased

Bishop of Molfetta-Giovinazzo-Terlizzi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jul 1884BornCessapalombo
16 Mar 190722.7Ordained PriestPriest
17 Oct 193551.2AppointedBishop of Molfetta-Giovinazzo-Terlizzi, Italy
17 Nov 193551.3Ordained BishopBishop of Molfetta-Giovinazzo-Terlizzi, Italy
18 Mar 197893.7DiedBishop of Molfetta-Giovinazzo-Terlizzi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Achille Salvucci:
Bishop Achille Salvucci (born , died ) Bishop of Molfetta-Giovinazzo-Terlizzi

  • a priest for 71.0 years
  • a bishop for 42.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1935, Number 89

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013