Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ettore Fronzi

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Camerino, Italy

Titular Archbishop of Melitene


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jun 1867Born
1889¹21.5Ordained PriestPriest of Senigallia, Italy
12 Sep 190841.2AppointedBishop of Cagli e Pergola, Italy
27 Sep 190841.2Ordained BishopBishop of Cagli e Pergola, Italy
14 Dec 191851.5AppointedArchbishop of Camerino, Italy
1 Oct 193871.3ResignedArchbishop of Camerino, Italy
1 Oct 193871.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Melitene
19 Feb 194072.6DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Camerino, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ettore Fronzi
Archbishop Ettore Fronzi (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Camerino

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOstra

  • a priest for 51.1 years
  • a bishop for 31.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1908, Number 56
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 104

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 13 Oct 2020

Quantcast