Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tito Maria Cucchi

Deceased

Bishop of Senigallia, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Mar 1860Born
23 Dec 188323.8Ordained PriestPriest
19 Apr 190040.1AppointedBishop of Senigallia, Italy
13 May 190040.1Ordained BishopBishop of Senigallia, Italy
8 Sep 193878.5DiedBishop of Senigallia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Tito Maria Cucchi
Bishop Tito Maria Cucchi (born , died ) Bishop of Senigallia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCerasa

  • a priest for 54.7 years
  • a bishop for 38.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 513

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018