Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luca Piergiovanni

Deceased

Bishop of Tarquinia e Civitavecchia, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Mar 1876Born
19 Apr 189923.0Ordained PriestPriest of Pesaro, Italy
10 Nov 191741.6AppointedBishop of Tarquinia e Civitavecchia, Italy
2 Feb 191841.8Ordained BishopBishop of Tarquinia e Civitavecchia, Italy
21 Sep 192549.5DiedBishop of Tarquinia e Civitavecchia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Luca Piergiovanni
Bishop Luca Piergiovanni (born , died ) Bishop of Tarquinia e Civitavecchia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNovilara
Ordained PriestRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Ordained BishopCathedral, Pesaro, Diocese of Pesaro

  • a priest for 26.4 years
  • a bishop for 7.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1918, Number 6
  • op/ob/c1+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 79, Number 6,417

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 13 Oct 2020

Quantcast