Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Gandolfi

Deceased

Bishop of Jesi, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Aug 1858Born
4 Apr 188526.6Ordained PriestPriest
14 Dec 189941.3AppointedBishop of Poggio Mirteto, Italy
21 Dec 189941.3Ordained BishopBishop of Poggio Mirteto, Italy
1 Dec 190648.2AppointedBishop of Jesi, Italy
14 Sep 192769.0DiedBishop of Jesi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Gandolfi
Bishop Giuseppe Gandolfi (born , died ) Bishop of Jesi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceJesi, Diocese of Jesi
Ordained BishopMontecitorio, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 42.4 years
  • a bishop for 27.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 362
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 39
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1899, Number 72

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 18 Jun 2017