Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicola Cola

Deceased

Bishop of Nocera Umbra-Gualdo Tadino, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Oct 1869Born
15 Apr 191040.4AppointedBishop of Marsi, Italy
29 Jun 191040.6Ordained BishopBishop of Marsi, Italy
14 Aug 191040.8ResignedBishop of Marsi, Italy
26 Aug 191040.8AppointedBishop of Nocera Umbra, Italy
2 Apr 191141.4InstalledBishop of Nocera Umbra, Italy
14 Apr 194070.4DiedBishop of Nocera Umbra-Gualdo Tadino, Italy

MicroData Summary for Nicola Cola
Bishop Nicola Cola (born , died ) Bishop of Nocera Umbra-Gualdo Tadino

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMecciano

  • a bishop for 29.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,927
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,941
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 242
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,910, Number 54

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast