Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pietro Paolo Camillo Moreschini, C.P. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Camerino


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Oct 1858BornFermo
9 Jul 187617.7ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Passion
29 Apr 190950.5AppointedArchbishop of Camerino, Italy
3 May 190950.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of Camerino, Italy
24 Oct 191860.0DiedArchbishop of Camerino, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pietro Paolo Camillo Moreschini:
Archbishop Pietro Paolo Camillo Moreschini C.P. (born , died ) Archbishop of Camerino

  • a bishop for 9.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1919
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1909, Number 20
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 106

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013