Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Henri Doulcet, C.P. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Nicopoli, Bulgaria

Titular Archbishop of Doclea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Apr 1857Born
30 May 188528.0Ordained PriestPriest
18 Oct 188831.4ProfessedPriest of Congregation of the Passion
7 Jan 189537.6AppointedBishop of Nicopoli, Bulgaria
24 Feb 189537.8Ordained BishopBishop of Nicopoli, Bulgaria
31 Mar 191355.9ResignedBishop of Nicopoli, Bulgaria
3 Jun 191356.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Ionopolis
17 Mar 191456.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Doclea
27 Jul 191659.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Nicopoli, Bulgaria

MicroData Summary for Henri Doulcet (VIAF: 88837858)
Archbishop Henri Doulcet C.P. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Nicopoli

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParis, Archdiocese of Paris, France
Ordained BishopSts. John and Paul, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 31.1 years
  • a bishop for 21.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1917
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 413
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 157
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1895, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 5 Jun 2017