Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Franziskus von Paula Cardinal Schönborn

Deceased

Archbishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Giovanni e Paolo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jan 1844Born
10 Aug 187329.5Ordained DeaconDeacon of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
12 Aug 187329.5Ordained PriestPriest of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
7 Sep 188339.6SelectedBishop of České Budĕjovice {Budweis}, Czech Republic
28 Sep 188339.6ConfirmedBishop of České Budĕjovice {Budweis}, Czech Republic
18 Nov 188339.8Ordained BishopBishop of České Budĕjovice {Budweis}, Czech Republic
25 Nov 188339.8InstalledBishop of České Budĕjovice {Budweis}, Czech Republic
21 May 188541.3SelectedArchbishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
27 Jul 188541.5ConfirmedArchbishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
24 May 188945.3Elevated to Cardinal
30 Dec 188945.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Giovanni e Paolo
25 Jun 189955.4DiedArchbishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic

MicroData Summary for Franziskus von Paula Schönborn (VIAF: 84332895)
Franziskus von Paula Cardinal Schönborn (born , died ) Archbishop of Praha {Prague}

EventPlace
Birth PlacePraha, Archdiocese of Praha {Prague}
Ordained BishopSt Sauveur, Praha, Archdiocese of Praha {Prague}

  • a priest for 25.8 years
  • a bishop for 15.6 years
  • a cardinal for 10.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 161, and Page 469
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 48
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 24 May 1889
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1883, Number 59

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 18 Apr 2017