Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stanislao Maria de Luca

Deceased

Bishop of San Severo, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Dec 1829Born
17 Dec 185324.0Ordained DeaconDeacon
23 Sep 185424.8Ordained PriestPriest
24 Mar 188454.3AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of San Marco e Bisignano, Italy
24 Mar 188454.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Teos
30 Mar 188454.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Teos
19 Sep 188858.7SucceededBishop of San Marco e Bisignano, Italy
18 May 189464.4AppointedBishop of San Severo, Italy
7 Jan 189565.0DiedBishop of San Severo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Stanislao Maria de Luca
Bishop Stanislao Maria de Luca (born , died ) Bishop of San Severo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBari, Archdiocese of Bari (-Canosa)
Ordained BishopS. Andre delle Fratte, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 40.2 years
  • a bishop for 10.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 365, and Page 515
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 539
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1884, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 18 Apr 2017