Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Josef Jan Evangelista Hais

Deceased

Bishop of Hradec Králové, Czech Republic


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Feb 1829Born
2 Nov 185122.7Ordained PriestPriest of České Budĕjovice {Budweis}, Czech Republic
27 May 187546.2SelectedBishop of Hradec Králové, Czech Republic
5 Jul 187546.4ConfirmedBishop of Hradec Králové, Czech Republic
25 Jul 187546.4Ordained BishopBishop of Hradec Králové, Czech Republic
27 Oct 189263.7DiedBishop of Hradec Králové, Czech Republic

MicroData Summary for Josef Jan Evangelista Hais (VIAF: 83719427)
Bishop Josef Jan Evangelista Hais (born , died ) Bishop of Hradec Králové

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBudětic, Diocese of České Budĕjovice {Budweis}
Ordained BishopBudweis, Diocese of České Budĕjovice {Budweis}

  • a priest for 40.9 years
  • a bishop for 17.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 479
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1875, Number 42

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 11 Apr 2017