Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jan Valerián Jirsík

Deceased

Bishop of České Budĕjovice {Budweis}, Czech Republic


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jun 1798Born
3 Aug 182022.1Ordained DeaconDeacon
28 Dec 182022.5Ordained PriestPriest
25 Mar 185152.7SelectedBishop of České Budĕjovice {Budweis}, Czech Republic
5 Sep 185153.2ConfirmedBishop of České Budĕjovice {Budweis}, Czech Republic
19 Oct 185153.3Ordained BishopBishop of České Budĕjovice {Budweis}, Czech Republic
23 Feb 188384.6DiedBishop of České Budĕjovice {Budweis}, Czech Republic

MicroData Summary for Jan Valerián Jirsík (VIAF: 13151277)
Bishop Jan Valerián Jirsík (born , died ) Bishop of České Budĕjovice {Budweis}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKačov
Ordained BishopSt. Vitus, Cathedral, Praha, Archdiocese of Praha {Prague}

  • a priest for 62.1 years
  • a bishop for 31.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 161
  • c34: ATh, 7 Nov 2015
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Number 18,645
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1851, Number 48

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 22 Jan 2017