Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Karel Boromejský Hanl z Kirchtreu

Deceased

Bishop of Hradec Králové


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Sep 1782BornGrosskörblitz
5 Sep 180523.0Ordained DeaconDeacon
8 Sep 180523.0Ordained PriestPriest
3 Nov 183149.2SelectedBishop of Hradec Králové, Czech Republic
24 Feb 183249.5ConfirmedBishop of Hradec Králové, Czech Republic
6 May 183249.7Ordained BishopBishop of Hradec Králové, Czech Republic
7 Oct 187492.1DiedBishop of Hradec Králové, Czech Republic

MicroData Summary for Karel Boromejský Hanl z Kirchtreu:
Bishop Karel Boromejský Hanl z Kirchtreu (born , died ) Bishop of Hradec Králové

  • a priest for 69.1 years
  • a bishop for 42.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 320

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013