Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop František Vilém Tippmann

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic

Titular Bishop of Satala in Armenia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jun 1786Born
30 Jul 180923.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
6 Aug 180923.1Ordained PriestPriest of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
17 Dec 183246.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
17 Dec 183246.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Satala in Armenia
3 Mar 183346.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Satala in Armenia
20 Jun 185771.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic

MicroData Summary for František Vilém Tippmann
Bishop František Vilém Tippmann (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceJoachimsthal, Archdiocese of Praha {Prague}

  • a priest for 47.8 years
  • a bishop for 24.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1838
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 336
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1833, Number 9
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 230, Number 19,188

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast