Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Karol Franz (Karel František) Prucha (Průcha)

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}

Titular Bishop of Ioppe


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Sep 1818BornNové Hrady
26 Jul 184122.8Ordained DeaconDeacon
5 Sep 184123.0Ordained PriestPriest
6 Mar 187152.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
6 Mar 187152.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Ioppe
16 Apr 187152.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ioppe
23 Oct 188365.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic

MicroData Summary for Karol Franz (Karel František) Prucha (Průcha) (VIAF: 83873604)
Bishop Karol Franz (Karel František) Prucha (Průcha) (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}

  • a priest for 42.1 years
  • a bishop for 12.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 323
  • obp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 229, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 27 Sep 2016