Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Augustin Pavel Wahala

Deceased

Bishop of Litoměřice, Czech Republic


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jan 1802Born
18 Sep 182725.6Ordained DeaconDeacon
22 Sep 182725.6Ordained PriestPriest
16 Sep 186563.6SelectedBishop of Litoměřice, Czech Republic
8 Jan 186663.9ConfirmedBishop of Litoměřice, Czech Republic
8 Apr 186664.2Ordained BishopBishop of Litoměřice, Czech Republic
15 Apr 186664.2InstalledBishop of Litoměřice, Czech Republic
10 Sep 187775.6DiedBishop of Litoměřice, Czech Republic

MicroData Summary for Augustin Pavel Wahala (VIAF: 84337683)
Bishop Augustin Pavel Wahala (born , died ) Bishop of Litoměřice

EventPlace
Birth PlacePalzendorf, Archdiocese of Olomouc
Ordained BishopOlomouc, Archdiocese of Olomouc

  • a priest for 49.9 years
  • a bishop for 11.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 347
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1866, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 13 Mar 2017