Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franz Bernert

Deceased

Prefect of Meißen (Meissen) {Lusazia o Lausitz; Sassonia}, Germany

Titular Bishop of Azotus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Apr 1811Born
26 Jul 183423.3Ordained DeaconDeacon of Litoměřice, Czech Republic
4 Aug 183423.3Ordained PriestPriest of Litoměřice, Czech Republic
28 Jan 187664.8AppointedPrefect of Meißen (Meissen) {Lusazia o Lausitz; Sassonia}, Germany
28 Jan 187664.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Azotus
19 Mar 187664.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Azotus
18 Mar 189078.9DiedPrefect of Meißen (Meissen) {Lusazia o Lausitz; Sassonia}, Germany

MicroData Summary for Franz Bernert (VIAF: 107803766)
Bishop Franz Bernert (born , died ) Prefect of Meißen (Meissen) {Lusazia o Lausitz; Sassonia}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGrafenstein
Ordained BishopCathedral, Litoměřice, Diocese of Litoměřice, Czech Republic

  • a priest for 55.6 years
  • a bishop for 13.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 136
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1876, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 13 Mar 2017