Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Karel Nöttig

Deceased

Bishop of Brno, Czech Republic


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Dec 1806Born
4 Aug 183326.6Ordained DeaconDeacon
6 Aug 183326.6Ordained PriestPriest
29 Nov 187063.9AppointedBishop of Brno, Czech Republic
8 Jan 187164.0Ordained BishopBishop of Brno, Czech Republic
14 Jan 188275.0DiedBishop of Brno, Czech Republic

MicroData Summary for Karel Nöttig (VIAF: 84619157)
Bishop Karel Nöttig (born , died ) Bishop of Brno

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBělotin, Archdiocese of Olomouc
Ordained BishopSt. Pierre, Brno, Diocese of Brno

  • a priest for 48.4 years
  • a bishop for 11.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 160
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1871, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 27 Feb 2017